SD SB195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-14)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-14)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the distribution of the wind energy tax.
Title
Revise the distribution of the wind energy tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 2. S.J. 744 |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 732 Amendment cc195A |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 713 |
2013-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 813 |
2013-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 810 Amendment Cc195A |
2013-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 805 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 724 Amendment 195ftb |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 724 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 724 Amendment 195fc |
2013-03-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed Amendment 195jtc |
2013-03-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 629 |
2013-03-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 195jc |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 481 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 447 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed Amendment 195jta |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 402 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 195ja |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 222 |