SD SB197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 | |
2012-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 729 | |
2012-03-02 | First read in House H.J. 729 | |
2012-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2012-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 669 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 5. S.J. 668 | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. J.J. 659 | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 3. Amendment 197bn | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197bk | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 4. Amendment 197mw | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197bt | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. Amendment 197bs | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197be | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197ad | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. Amendment 197mf | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197bq | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197mk | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197bf | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 197ua | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 197bw | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 197br | |
2012-02-29 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 197mj | |
2012-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 260 |