SD SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 22. S.J. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adjust for inflation the amount of the special education appropriation that may be set aside for extraordinary expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjust for inflation the amount of the special education appropriation that may be set aside for extraordinary expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 22. S.J. 508
2019-02-22SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 1. S.J. 467
2019-02-22SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 2ta
2019-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback