SD SB23 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the authority of the Transportation Commission to make loans from the state highway fund to local governments for highway and bridge construction and maintenance purposes.
Title
Revise the authority of the Transportation Commission to make loans from the state highway fund to local governments for highway and bridge construction and maintenance purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 746 |
2017-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2017 S.J. 677 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 672 |
2017-03-02 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 603 |
2017-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 99 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 138 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 120 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 20 |