SD SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 S.J. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 S.J. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the authority of Department of Revenue special agents.
Title
Revise the authority of Department of Revenue special agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 S.J. 378 |
2019-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 S.J. 314 |
2019-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 334 |
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 295 |
2019-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 293 |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 276 |
2019-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 147 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 123 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 102 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 26 |