SD SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove certain unnecessary federal references and dates from certain provisions relating to the Department of Social Services.
Title
Remove certain unnecessary federal references and dates from certain provisions relating to the Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2019 S.J. 326 |
2019-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2019 S.J. 278 |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 301 |
2019-01-31 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 256 |
2019-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 268 |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 231 |
2019-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 147 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 123 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 102 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 27 |