SD SB35 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state aid to general and special education formula.
Title
Revise the state aid to general and special education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747 |
2017-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 742 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 759 |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 750 |
2017-03-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 732 |
2017-03-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 727 Amendment Cc35a |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 742 Amendment Cc35a |
2017-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 710 |
2017-03-08 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 677 |
2017-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 25. H.J. 690 |
2017-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 690 Amendment 35xa |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. H.J. 619 |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 35fe |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 535 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 527 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 310 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 259 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 237 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 225 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 194 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 82 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 22 |