SD SB35 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal provisions regarding revocation of occupational licenses.
Title
Revise and repeal provisions regarding revocation of occupational licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 S.J. 271 |
2019-01-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 246 |
2019-01-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 273 |
2019-01-29 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 218 |
2019-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 226 |
2019-01-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 148 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 127 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 127 Amendment 35db |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 98 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 70 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 28 |