SD SB40 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the transfer of certain real property to the Animal Industry Board.
Title
Authorize the transfer of certain real property to the Animal Industry Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 556 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473 |
2019-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453 |
2019-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2019-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423 |
2019-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398 |
2019-02-12 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 367 |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 282 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 236 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 209 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 29 |
Subjects
Agriculture and Horticulture
Board of Regents
Property
Public Officers and Employees
Public Property, Purchases, and Contracts
State Affairs and Government
Board of Regents
Property
Public Officers and Employees
Public Property, Purchases, and Contracts
State Affairs and Government