SD SB43 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalize the failure to report the death or disappearance of a child within a specified time by certain persons responsible for the care of the child.
Title
Criminalize the failure to report the death or disappearance of a child within a specified time by certain persons responsible for the care of the child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 633 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 1. S.J. 626 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 648 | |
2012-02-24 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 614 | |
2012-02-24 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 5. | |
2012-02-24 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 43ra | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 225 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 183 | |
2012-01-24 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 153 | |
2012-01-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 21 |