SD SB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to expand intensive methamphetamine treatment services within the Department of Social Services and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to expand intensive methamphetamine treatment services within the Department of Social Services and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2017 S.J. 747 |
2017-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2017 S.J. 677 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 15. H.J. 673 |
2017-03-02 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 606 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 601 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 580 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 131 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 122 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 24 |