SD SB44 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize, regulate, and tax wagering on sporting events within the city limits of Deadwood and provide a penalty for a violation thereof.
Title
Authorize, regulate, and tax wagering on sporting events within the city limits of Deadwood and provide a penalty for a violation thereof.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 496 |
2021-03-03 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 284 |
2021-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 272 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 228 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 44C |
2021-02-03 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 44B |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |