SD SB47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and revise certain provisions regarding permits to carry a concealed pistol.
Title
Repeal and revise certain provisions regarding permits to carry a concealed pistol.
Sponsors
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Rep. Dayle Hammock [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Isaac Latterell [R] |
Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260 |
2019-01-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 244 |
2019-01-30 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 220 |
2019-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 23. H.J. 240 |
2019-01-28 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 216 |
2019-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 168 |
2019-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 161 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 141 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 119 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 67 |