SD SB48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize counties on behalf of certain improvement districts to issue convention facility on-sale licenses to sell alcoholic beverages.
Title
Authorize counties on behalf of certain improvement districts to issue convention facility on-sale licenses to sell alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] | Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Rep. David Anderson [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732 |
2019-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 679 |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710 |
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 675 |
2019-03-07 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 660 |
2019-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 6. H.J. 633 |
2019-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612 |
2019-02-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed H.J. 563 Amendment 48cta |
2019-02-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 48ca |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 161 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 143 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 119 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 67 |