SD SB52 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 33. H.J. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Require a survey to determine the adequacy of civics and history instruction in accredited schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require a survey to determine the adequacy of civics and history instruction in accredited schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 33. H.J. 700
2019-03-06HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 657
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 518
2019-02-22SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 480 Amendment 52cta
2019-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 479
2019-02-22SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 478 Amendment 52cb
2019-02-13SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366
2019-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 198
2019-01-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 182
2019-01-24SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 161
2019-01-22SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 136
2019-01-22SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 52ca
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 106

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback