SD SB53 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain retailers to offer quantity discounts or cash discounts for the purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Authorize certain retailers to offer quantity discounts or cash discounts for the purchase of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 574 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473 |
2019-02-20 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 447 |
2019-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 208 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 170 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed S.J. 135 Amendment 53yta |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 53ya |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 106 |