SD SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate the use of care and maintenance funds by perpetual care cemeteries.
Title
Regulate the use of care and maintenance funds by perpetual care cemeteries.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim White [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. John Lake [R] | Rep. Steven McCleerey [D] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Nancy York [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732 |
2019-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672 |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 637 |
2019-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 633 |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 328 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 281 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 245 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54ja |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 121 |