SD SB55 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the shooting of coyotes from snowmobiles.
Title
Allow the shooting of coyotes from snowmobiles.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] |
Sen. Tom Hansen [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 645 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 652 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 588 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 550 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 549 Amendment 55ra | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 534 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 526 | |
2011-02-22 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459 | |
2011-02-22 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55td | |
2011-02-22 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55te | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 265 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 283 | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 220 | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55tc | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. Amendment 55tb | |
2011-01-27 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55ta | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-14 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 78 |