SD SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require the national motto of the United States to be displayed in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require the national motto of the United States to be displayed in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 13. S.J. 588
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 19. H.J. 576
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 576 Amendment 55wa
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 514 Amendment 55ota
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2.
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55kc
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 55ja
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 328
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 283
2019-01-31SenateEducation Title amended, Passed S.J. 244 Amendment 55cta
2019-01-31SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2019-01-31SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 55ca
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 122

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=55&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB55P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB55SED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB55HST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB55H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB55ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27720&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27721&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27855&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28761&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28977&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29101&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback