SD SB56 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provision regarding the regulation of fireworks and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provision regarding the regulation of fireworks and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Title amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 679
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 661
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 634
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
2019-02-27HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 564
2019-02-27HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 56cb
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 328
2019-02-06SenateSenate Title amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 294 Amendment 56wta
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 294
2019-02-06SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 287 Amendment 56wc
2019-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 266
2019-01-31SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 248
2019-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 198
2019-01-24SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 160
2019-01-24SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 56wb
2019-01-24SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 56wa
2019-01-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 122

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=56&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB56P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB56SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB56S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB56HCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB56ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27416&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27868&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28939&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29172&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29323&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback