SD SB63 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the penalty for a subsequent conviction for trespass to hunt, fish, or trap.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the penalty for a subsequent conviction for trespass to hunt, fish, or trap.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 571
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2019-02-14HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 403
2019-02-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 329
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 281
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 243
2019-01-31SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 63ba
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 139

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback