SD SB64 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require certain wind energy facilities to include aircraft detection lighting systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require certain wind energy facilities to include aircraft detection lighting systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 670
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 590
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 577
2019-02-25HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 515
2019-02-25HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 64da
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 450
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 404
2019-02-14SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 380
2019-02-14SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 64wb
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4.
2019-01-31SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 64wa
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 140

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=64&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB64P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB64HCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB64ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27727&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28316&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28402&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28783&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28978&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29103&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback