SD SB66 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund property tax and sales tax refunds for certain elderly persons and persons with a disability.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund property tax and sales tax refunds for certain elderly persons and persons with a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 683 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 567 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 658 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 | |
2010-02-24 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 596 | |
2010-02-24 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 66ba | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 268 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 199 | |
2010-01-28 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 158 | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 80 |