SD SB66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-8)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an interim legislative committee to study issues related to electric services in an annexed area.
Title
Establish an interim legislative committee to study issues related to electric services in an annexed area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732 |
2019-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672 |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 647 |
2019-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 18. H.J. 667 |
2019-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 633 |
2019-03-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 599 |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 551 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 508 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Title amended, Passed S.J. 467 Amendment 66wtb |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 66wb |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 140 |