SD SB67 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding challenges to certain election petition signatures.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding challenges to certain election petition signatures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 734 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 786 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 730 |
2015-03-13 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 0. S.J. 728 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 706 |
2015-03-06 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 638 |
2015-03-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 67oa |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 305 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 290 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 274 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 253 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 239 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 224 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 197 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 177 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 108 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 95 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 76 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 29 |