SD SB71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit capital punishment of any person with severe mental illness.
Title
Prohibit capital punishment of any person with severe mental illness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 363 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary Reconsidered, Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 330 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 299 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 155 |