SD SB72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate persons offering speech-language pathology to the public.
Title
Regulate persons offering speech-language pathology to the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 500 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 11. H.J. 512 | |
2012-02-14 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 455 | |
2012-02-14 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 72ra | |
2012-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 239 | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 2. S.J. 201 | |
2012-01-25 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 165 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 97 |