SD SB73 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise qualifications for sanitary district trustees.
Title
Revise qualifications for sanitary district trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642 |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 670 |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 618 |
2019-03-04 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 590 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 23. H.J. 574 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 573 Amendment 73yb |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2019-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543 |
2019-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486 |
2019-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473 |
2019-02-19 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 430 |
2019-02-19 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 73ya |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 329 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 286 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 266 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 248 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 224 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 156 |