SD SB75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding who is eligible to serve as a candidate in the event of a vacancy.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding who is eligible to serve as a candidate in the event of a vacancy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 552 |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 514 |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 282 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 237 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 237 Amendment 75ca |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 215 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 196 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 156 |