SD SB78 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the total amount of revenue payable to municipalities from taxes on real property.
Title
Revise the total amount of revenue payable to municipalities from taxes on real property.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Gant [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Rep. Martha Vanderlinde [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 627 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 1. H.J. 733 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-02 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 646 | |
2010-03-02 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78fb | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 316 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 232 | |
2010-02-01 | Taxation Title amended, Passed Amendment 78fta | |
2010-02-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-01 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 177 | |
2010-02-01 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 78fa | |
2010-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 109 |