SD SB8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a statewide resource information system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a statewide resource information system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - State Affairs Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 12. H.J. 732
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 729 Amendment Cc8a
2019-03-12HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 731
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 3. S.J. 712
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 700 Amendment Cc8a
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 695
2019-03-07HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 659
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 638
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 638 Amendment 8ta
2019-03-04HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 603
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4. S.J. 516
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8ja
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 8kta
2019-02-08SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8kb
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8ka
2019-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=8&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8SST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8JAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB8ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28016&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28784&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29022&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29182&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29466&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29491&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback