SD SB85 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the deadline for the Department of Health's annual report regarding abortions.
Title
Revise the deadline for the Department of Health's annual report regarding abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 569 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 548 |
2019-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 371 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 310 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 164 |