SD SB86 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 8. H.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding certain tax rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding certain tax rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 8. H.J. 692
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 651 Amendment 86jta
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4.
2019-03-06HouseState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 86jb
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseState Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed
2019-03-04HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 86wg
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-28HouseReferred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 588
2019-02-28HouseTaxation Deferred to another day, Passed
2019-02-28HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. Amendment 86oa
2019-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 371
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 333
2019-02-08SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 312
2019-02-08SenateTaxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. Amendment 86wc
2019-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06SenateTaxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. Amendment 86wb
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 164

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=86&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB86P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB86HST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27849&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28006&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28011&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28104&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28996&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29216&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29339&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback