SD SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 31. S.J. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the Firearms Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the Firearms Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 31. S.J. 506
2019-02-21SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Title amended, Passed S.J. 452 Amendment 9wta
2019-02-21SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
2019-02-21SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 9wa
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 95
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback