SD SB9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise various provisions related to bank trust departments and trust companies.
Title
Revise various provisions related to bank trust departments and trust companies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 S.J. 199 |
2021-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 174 |
2021-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 180 |
2021-02-01 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-01 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 119 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 96 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 9B |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 12 |