SD SB90 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ensure that members of the public are able to access and record public meetings.
Title
Ensure that members of the public are able to access and record public meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 799 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 766 |
2016-03-01 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 344 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 250 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 209 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 90rb |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 139 |
Subjects
Counties
Legislature and Statutes
Local Government
Municipal Government
Public Officers and Employees
School Board
State Affairs and Government
Legislature and Statutes
Local Government
Municipal Government
Public Officers and Employees
School Board
State Affairs and Government