SD SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the signature requirements for municipal elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the signature requirements for municipal elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
2019-03-06HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 S.J. 630
2019-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the President S.J. 600
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589
2019-02-27HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-27HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 562
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 342
2019-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 302
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 273
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 166

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback