SD SB94 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 725
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 725
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money in order to fund the fiscal year 2014 health insurance shortfall for Board of Regents employees compensated from tuition, fees, and other funds, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Appropriate money in order to fund the fiscal year 2014 health insurance shortfall for Board of Regents employees compensated from tuition, fees, and other funds, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 725 |
2014-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 689 |
2014-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 659 |
2014-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 637 |
2014-03-03 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 533 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 434 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 377 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 94da |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 129 |