SD SB94 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding rule-making authority to establish certain fuel standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding rule-making authority to establish certain fuel standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 451
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 94ja
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 166

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback