SD SB98 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the employment of a city manager and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the employment of a city manager and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 561 | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 509 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 447 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 452 | |
2011-02-14 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 | |
2011-02-14 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 98fa | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 176 |