SD SB98 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding pork production.
Title
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding pork production.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 832 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 774 |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 414 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 307 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 290 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 149 |