SD SB99 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions regarding commercial security deposits.
Title
Establish certain provisions regarding commercial security deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642 |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 670 |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 618 |
2019-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 606 |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 588 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-27 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 565 |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 329 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 283 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 261 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 167 |