SD SCR13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 677
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the "Know Before You Fly" campaign as an official source of safety education for operators of unmanned aircraft systems and instructing the Department of Public Safety to educate the public about the campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the "Know Before You Fly" campaign as an official source of safety education for operators of unmanned aircraft systems and instructing the Department of Public Safety to educate the public about the campaign.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 677
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced H.J. 663
2019-03-05SenateSenate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 608
2019-03-04SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-04SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 562
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 499

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback