SD SCR4 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 702
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 702
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing certain federal legislation related to equine slaughter and processing and urging the reinstatement and funding of federal inspection programs governing equine slaughter and processing facilities.
Title
Opposing certain federal legislation related to equine slaughter and processing and urging the reinstatement and funding of federal inspection programs governing equine slaughter and processing facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 702 | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced H.J. 679 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 509 Amendment c4ta | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 509 | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced S.J. 486 |