SD SCR4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 77-24)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the concept and further development of South Dakota First, an initiative for success and development.
Title
Supporting the concept and further development of South Dakota First, an initiative for success and development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 429 | |
2012-02-10 | Introduced H.J. 412 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 334 | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced S.J. 317 |