SD SCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-25 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commending Senators John Thune and Mike Rounds for their votes to confirm Brett Kavanaugh's nomination to the United States Supreme Court, and wishing Associate Justice Kavanaugh well in his new role.
Title
Commending Senators John Thune and Mike Rounds for their votes to confirm Brett Kavanaugh's nomination to the United States Supreme Court, and wishing Associate Justice Kavanaugh well in his new role.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | Senate | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 140 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 105 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 103 Amendment c5ja |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 71 |