SD SCR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - House of Representatives Do Not Concur in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - House of Representatives Do Not Concur in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the President of the United States to make agricultural exports a priority and protect agricultural products from all current and future tariffs.
Title
Urging the President of the United States to make agricultural exports a priority and protect agricultural products from all current and future tariffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Do Not Concur in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 390 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 370 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 330 Amendment c6jta |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 329 Amendment c6ja |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 319 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 298 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 182 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 151 |