SD SCR7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Directing the Executive Board to create a fifteen-member task force to study and make legislative proposals regarding alternatives to imprisonment for those convicted of the crime of ingestion of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Executive Board to create a fifteen-member task force to study and make legislative proposals regarding alternatives to imprisonment for those convicted of the crime of ingestion of controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Adopt Resolution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Judiciary Referred as Amended to Senate Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateSenate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 519
2019-02-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512
2019-02-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 470
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 445
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05SenateJudiciary Referred as Amended to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 273
2019-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3.
2019-01-31SenateJudiciary Motion to amend resolution, Passed Amendment c7wa
2019-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 180

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback