TN HB0003 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a court that issues orders granting custody or guardianship of children to relative caregivers to inform the relative caregiver that resources and funding may be available through the department of children's services; requires the department of children's services to distribute information on available relative caregiver resources to the administrative office of the courts, and the administrative office of the courts to distribute the information to each court within the state that issues orders regarding child custody or guardianship. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
As enacted, requires a court that issues orders granting custody or guardianship of children to relative caregivers to inform the relative caregiver that resources and funding may be available through the department of children's services; requires the department of children's services to distribute information on available relative caregiver resources to the administrative office of the courts, and the administrative office of the courts to distribute the information to each court within the state that issues orders regarding child custody or guardianship. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 36 and Title 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 130 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-21 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 92, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0003 |
2019-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3-21-19 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0002) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/5/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-11-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0012 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 130