TN HB0034 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a local board of education to authorize a teacher, school employee, or other person employed by the LEA to raise funds for noneducational purposes; requires the local board of education that authorizes funds to be raised for noneducational purposes to create policies and procedures for the receipt, disbursement, and accounting of funds raised. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows a local board of education to authorize a teacher, school employee, or other person employed by the LEA to raise funds for noneducational purposes; requires the local board of education that authorizes funds to be raised for noneducational purposes to create policies and procedures for the receipt, disbursement, and accounting of funds raised. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Pub. Ch. 134
2019-04-15 Effective date(s) 04/09/2019
2019-04-09 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-01HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-18SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0113)
2019-03-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-07HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-03-07HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0019)
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-01-19HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0375 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 134

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback